CA AB379 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 48853, 48853.5, 49069.5, 51225.1, and 51225.2 of, and to amend the heading of Chapter 5.5 (commencing with Section 48850) of Part 27 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, the Education Code, relating to foster youth.
Title
Foster youth: homeless children or youth: complaint of noncompliance: exemption from local graduation requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 379 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB379 Gordon By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 379 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB379 Gordon By Mitchell (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 379 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 772, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3139.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2693.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1801.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25). |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 48853.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49069.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51225.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51225.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |