CA AB370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 16 (commencing with Section 2380) to Chapter 5 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians and surgeons: forms: fee limitations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2019-03-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2019-02-15AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and HEALTH.
2019-02-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
2019-02-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code2380New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback