CA AB37 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 89519 of, and to repeal and add Section 89517.5 of, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign funds: security expenses.
Sponsors
Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Assembly - AB 37 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB37 Bonta et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 37 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB37 Bonta et al. By Wiener (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 37 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2023-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3468.). |
2023-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2701.). |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-31 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-08-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1588.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-12-09 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 5. |
2022-12-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 89517.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 89519 | Amended Code | Citation Text |