CA AB369 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 15926 of, and to add Sections 14011.67, 14133.55, 14133.56, 14133.57, and 14301.12 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal services: persons experiencing homelessness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 369 Kamlager Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WEBER, A (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB369 Kamlager et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 369 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB369 Kamlager et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 369 Kamlager Assembly Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2705.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2233.). |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1627.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1460.) |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14011.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14133.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14133.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14133.57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14301.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 15926 | Amended Code | Citation Text |