CA AB368 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 76004 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

College and Career Access Pathways partnerships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 368 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB368 Holden By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB368 Holden By Smallwood-Cuevas Motion To Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB368 Holden By Smallwood-Cuevas (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 368 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2023.
2023-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2023-09-19 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2023-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3283.).
2023-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.)
2023-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2023-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2582.).
2023-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-09-05SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-09-05SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2355.)
2023-09-05SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2355.)
2023-06-29SenateOrdered to third reading.
2023-06-29SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2023-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-26SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-06-07SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-31SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2023-05-18SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1594.)
2023-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2023-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2023-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-05-01AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2023-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2023-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2023-03-06AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2023-03-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-02AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED.
2023-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2023-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code76004Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback