CA AB368 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1410 of the Military and Veterans Code, relating to veterans cemeteries.
Title
Southern California Veterans Cemetery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 368 QUIRK-SILVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB368 Quirk-Silva et al. By Archuleta (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 368 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB368 Quirk-Silva et al. By Archuleta (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 368 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 284, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:30 a.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3327.). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3327.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3327.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2734.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-28 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1864.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Military and Veterans Code | 1410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |