CA AB366 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11167.5 of the Penal Code, relating to child abuse reporting, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse reporting: confidentiality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 366 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-23SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-21SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Page 5566.)
2018-08-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-08-09SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-07-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2017-07-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-28SenateIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-20SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-06-13SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-05-10SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2017-04-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-04-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 962.)
2017-03-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-03-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21).
2017-03-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-03-14AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2017-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1033.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11167.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code106.4Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback