CA AB366 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11167.5 of the Penal Code, relating to child abuse reporting, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Child abuse reporting: confidentiality.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Jay Obernolte [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - Assembly - AB 366 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Page 5566.) |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 3. Page 962.) |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1033.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11167.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 106.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |