CA AB361 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 13 (commencing with Section 14600) to Division 3 of Title 1 of the Corporations Code, relating to benefit corporations.
Title
Benefit corporations.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Blumenfield [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Asm. Jared Huffman [D] |
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-29 - Assembly - AB 361 HUFFMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB361 Huffman By Leno (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 361 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB361 Huffman By Leno (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Assembly - AB 361 HUFFMAN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 728, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-09-01 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-29 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2647.). | |
2011-08-22 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2011-08-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 2008.). | |
2011-08-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2011-07-12 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-07-11 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 5). | |
2011-06-30 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-06-15 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. | |
2011-05-26 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 1560.) | |
2011-05-23 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 18). | |
2011-05-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 3). | |
2011-04-28 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-04-27 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-04-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-15 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. | |
2011-02-14 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 14600 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 25600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |