CA AB360 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Re-referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 320.1 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment insurance, making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment Development Department: Unemployment Insurance Reform Project.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on INS.
2021-03-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2021-02-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 4.
2021-02-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Unemployment Insurance Code320.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback