CA AB356 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Died on inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3106 and 3401 of, and to add Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 3130) to Chapter 1 of Division 3 of, the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 13227.5 to the Water Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: groundwater monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Assembly - AB 356 WILLIAMS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Died on inactive file. |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. (Page 1972.) Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Williams. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 33. Page 1927.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Williams. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 28). |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 27). |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 3130 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 3106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 3106.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 13227.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |