CA AB354 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9160, 9280, 9313, 9314, and 9500 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local ballot measures: impartial analysis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-22 - Assembly - AB 354 DAHLE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB354 Dahle By Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 354 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-09 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-29AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2013-08-22AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2650.).
2013-08-19AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2013-08-19SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1886.).
2013-07-09SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2013-06-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2013-06-10SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-05-29SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2013-05-20SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2013-05-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1526.)
2013-05-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-05-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2013-04-24AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2013-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2013-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_354&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130320_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130423_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130514_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130612_amended_sen_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130612_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130709_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130213_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130320_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130423_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130514_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130612_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130709_amended_sen_v94.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130827_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_bill_20130909_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_vote_20130507_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_vote_20130520_0246PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_vote_20130702_000005_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_vote_20130819_0211PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0351-0400/ab_354_vote_20130822_0922AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback