CA AB354 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 9160, 9280, 9313, 9314, and 9500 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Local ballot measures: impartial analysis.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - AB 354 DAHLE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB354 Dahle By Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 354 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB354 Dahle By Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Assembly - AB 354 DAHLE Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2650.). |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1886.). |
2013-07-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1526.) |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 7). |
2013-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 303.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9280 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9313 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9314 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |