CA AB353 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13193.5 to the Water Code, relating to water quality, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Once-through cooling policy: extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 353 Muratsuchi Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1522.) |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 13193.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |