CA AB350 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10010 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
District-based municipal elections: preapproval hearings.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - AB 350 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB350 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 350 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB350 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Assembly - AB 350 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-05 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Elections and Redistricting (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 737, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6537.). |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 29). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6265.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 6294.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on E. & R.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in, but first be re-referred to Com. on E. & R. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5250.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 3474.) |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (January 19). |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3367.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2016-01-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 5). Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 10010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 14027 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 14029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 12022 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 12022.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Food and Agricultural Code | 12023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 34887 | New Code | See Bill Text |