CA AB349 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 14021.6 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug Medi-Cal Treatment Program: ratesetting process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 349 MCCARTY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB349 McCarty By Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AB 349 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 30 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committees on [Veterans Affairs] and [Public Employees, Retirement, and Social Security] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 643, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-21 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2018-08-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5439.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-06-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-11SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-07SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-21SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-14SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12).
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD.
2017-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 41. Noes 30. Page 1547.)
2017-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 10).
2017-04-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and P.E., R., & S.S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2017-03-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2017-03-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2017-02-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-02-09AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 11.
2017-02-08AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code117New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code18973Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code18980New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14021.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback