CA AB346 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 34176.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to local government.
Title
Redevelopment: housing successor: Low and Moderate Income Housing Asset Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Daly [D] | Asm. William Brough [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB346 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 346 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 346 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 35, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-06-16 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1487.). |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 6). |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1478.) |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2017-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 34176.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |