CA AB346 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 40302 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle infractions and misdemeanors: arrests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #3 AB346 Wilk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - AB 346 WILK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-14 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 82, Statutes of 2015.
2015-07-14 Approved by the Governor.
2015-07-02 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2015-07-02 Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
2015-06-29 Enrolled measure version corrected.
2015-06-26AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2015-06-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2015-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1550.).
2015-06-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2015-06-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-06-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9).
2015-05-07SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2015-04-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2015-04-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 975.)
2015-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13).
2015-03-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2015-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2015-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code40302Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_346&sess=1516&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_bill_20150213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_bill_20150624_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_bill_20150714_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_vote_20150413_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_vote_20150416_0952AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_vote_20150609_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_346_vote_20150622_0403PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback