CA AB345 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 343, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 343, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65852.2 and 65852.26 of the Government Code, relating to land use.
Title
Accessory dwelling units: separate conveyance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 345 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB345 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 345 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB345 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 345 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 343, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2704.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2240.). |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1599.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2021-03-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65852.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65852.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |