CA AB345 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12805.4 to the Government Code, and to add Section 3203.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to natural resources.
Title
Natural resources: environmental justice: oil and gas: regulation of operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-05 - Senate - [08-05-2020] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 345 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Assembly - AB 345 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 30 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 30. Page 3911.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3893.) |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (January 23). |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 22). |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12805.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3203.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |