CA AB343 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 17200) to Part 1 of Division 9 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animal cruelty: duty to provide documentary evidence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-03AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2014-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2013-04-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-04-15AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2013-04-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-04-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2013-03-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
2013-03-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and PUB. S.
2013-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2013-02-13AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code16441Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code17200New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_343&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130318_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130318_amended_asm_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130411_amended_asm_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130411_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130213_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130318_amended_asm_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130401_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0301-0350/ab_343_bill_20130411_amended_asm_v96.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback