CA AB341 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 782 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Credibility of witnesses: sexual conduct: social media content.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB341 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - AB 341 Boerner Horvath Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 24, Statutes of 2021.
2021-06-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-06-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
2021-06-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-06-17SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-06-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8).
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-04-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-04-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 932.)
2021-04-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2021-03-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 23).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-29AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 28.
2021-01-28AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Evidence Code782Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback