CA AB34 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 5.6 (commencing with Section 234.6) to Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of the Education Code, relating to pupils.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupils: bullying and harassment prevention information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 34 Ramos Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB34 Ramos et al. By Rubio (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 34 Ramos Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2891.).
2019-08-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-08-26SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2281.).
2019-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-01SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-01SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-06-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-24SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1473.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
2018-12-03AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code234.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback