CA AB337 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 23, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 23, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 71000 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB337 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 337 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - AB 337 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 23, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-06-22 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m. | |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1544.). |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 961.) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 24). |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 28. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 71000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |