CA AB3366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 68115 of the Government Code, relating to judicial emergencies, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Judicial emergencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3366 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 3366 JUD. Third Reading Urgency By STONE (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 3366 JUD. Third Reading Urgency By STONE (Y: 62 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 76, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 2. Page 4398.). |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-07-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 2. Page 4853.). |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4693.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 4624.) |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2020-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 5. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 68115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |