CA AB3361 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-04 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 29009, 29020, 29021, 29023, 29024, 29025, 29026, 29027, 29028, 29030.5, 29031, 29032, 29043, 29044, 29049, 29050, 29053, 29110, 29111, 29120, 29121, 29122, 29151, 29152, 29153, 29154, 29156, 29157, 29190, 29191, 29192, 29194, 29201, 29207, 29210, 29212, 29213, 29300, 29301, 29304, 29308, 29309, 29310, 29441, 29442, 29443, 29503, 29504, 29551, 29552, 29558, 29559, 29560, and 29733 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to the Department of Food and Agriculture.
Title
Department of Food and Agriculture: Secretary of Food and Agriculture: bee management and honey production.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2020-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 4. |
2020-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3361 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3361 |