CA AB335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3003 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parole: placement at release.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 335 Kiley Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB335 Kiley By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - AB 335 KILEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB335 Kiley By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - AB 335 KILEY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 523, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-20 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3338.). |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.) |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2751.). |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1188.) |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1138.) |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar by request of Assembly Member Kiley. To Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 3003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |