CA AB3311 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - Referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16430 and 16451 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 16430 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 16451 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3311 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3311 |