CA AB3308 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 199, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 199, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 53571, 53572, and 53574 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
School districts: employee housing.
Sponsors
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3308 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3308 Gabriel et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3308 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3308 Gabriel et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 3308 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 199, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5422.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 2.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (August 6). |
2020-07-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4680.) |
2020-05-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 53571 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53572 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 53574 | Amended Code | Citation Text |