CA AB3302 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to public employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State public employment: memorandum of understanding: State Bargaining Unit 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3302 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 4.)
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code3512Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback