CA AB3297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21168.5 and 21177 of, and to add Section 21168.11 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: projects for the development of new housing units: judicial review.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21168.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 21168.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3297 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3297 |