CA AB329 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13951 and 13956 of the Government Code, relating to victim compensation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Victim compensation: use of excessive force by law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - AB 329 Rodriguez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1862.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 13951 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 13956 | Amended Code | Citation Text |