CA AB3271 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.7 (commencing with Section 1002.7) to Title 14 of Part 2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to enrollment agreements.
Title
Enrollment agreements.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - AB 3271 Kiley Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2020-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4849.) |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4746.) |
2020-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-05-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1002.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |