CA AB327 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.28 (commencing with Section 6218.8) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to privacy.
Title
COVID-19 vaccination status: prohibition on required disclosure.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2021-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and E.M. |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6218.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |