CA AB327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 721 of the Family Code, and to add Section 21385 to the Probate Code, relating to estates and trusts.
Title
Estates and trusts: at-death transfers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent AB327 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - AB 327 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Assembly - AB 327 Maienschein Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 43, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1678.). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 4). |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 776.) |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 12). |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 721 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 21385 | New Code | See Bill Text |