CA AB327 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1720.4 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: volunteers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #3 AB327 Gordon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 327 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 327 GORDON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 53, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-06-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1550.). |
2015-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1453.) |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1720.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |