CA AB3263 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-28 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19605.25 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse racing: minisatellite wagering facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3263 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-28SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-28SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5220.)
2018-05-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2018-04-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee May 6.
2018-04-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19605.25Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback