CA AB3262 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-01 - Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1714.46 to the Civil Code, relating to civil liability.
Title
Product liability: electronic retail marketplaces.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3262 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 3262 Mark Stone Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 14. Page 4816.) |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (May 11). |
2020-05-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1714.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |