CA AB3261 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27, 101, 2525, 26051.5, 26067, 26068, 26070, 26161, and 26211 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 7 (commencing with Section 26070) of Division 10 of, and to add Section 26001.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3261 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3261 Low By Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3261 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3261 B. & P. Consent Calendar Second Day By LOW (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 599, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-29AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-28SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateAction rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Held at Desk.
2018-07-05AssemblyOrdered to the Senate.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 5 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5041.).
2018-06-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25).
2018-06-19SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5168.)
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2018-04-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee May 3.
2018-04-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback