CA AB326 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1348.9 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care service plans: Consumer Participation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 326 Luz Rivas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB326 Luz Rivas By Becker (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Assembly - AB 326 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 741, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2021-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15.).
2021-09-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.).
2021-09-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-03SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26).
2021-07-05SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-06-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-08SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 13. Page 1355.)
2021-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 14).
2021-03-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-01-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
2021-01-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1348.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback