CA AB326 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1742.1 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: prevailing wage rates: wage and penalty assessments.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-18 - Assembly - AB 326 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB326 Frazier By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Assembly - AB 326 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB326 Frazier By Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-15 - Assembly - AB 326 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-01-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 345, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5876.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4954.). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-01-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 3426.) |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 6). |
2016-01-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1742.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |