CA AB3256 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-08 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Division 47 (commencing with Section 80200) to the Public Resources Code, relating to an economic recovery, wildfire prevention, safe drinking water, drought preparation, and flood protection program, by providing the funds necessary therefor through an election of the issuance and sale of bonds of the State of California and for the handling and disposition of those funds, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Recovery, Wildfire Prevention, Safe Drinking Water, Drought Preparation, and Flood Protection Bond Act of 2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-08AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-06-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-06-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (June 3).
2020-06-02AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2020-05-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2020-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (May 13).
2020-05-07AssemblyMeasure version as amended on May 4 corrected.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2020-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-02-24AssemblyRead first time.
2020-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2020-02-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code80200New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback