CA AB3256 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 302, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14998, 14998.2, 14998.3, 14998.4, 14998.5, 14998.55, 14998.7, 14998.8, 14998.9, 14998.10, 14998.11, 14998.12, 14998.13, 14999.20, 14999.21, 14999.31, 14999.32, 14999.33, 14999.35, 14999.50, and 14999.55 of, and to repeal Section 14998.6 of, the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Film Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-13 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3256 A.,E.,S.,T., (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Assembly - AB 3256 A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 302, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-07 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-20AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-14AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5283.).
2018-08-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5438.)
2018-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 19.
2018-03-19AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14998Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.11Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.12Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.13Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14998.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.21Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.31Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.32Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.33Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.35Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.50Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14999.55Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback