CA AB3255 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44230, 66025.9, 68075, 68101, 69432.7, 69439, 69562, 76140, and 84760.5 of, to amend and repeal Sections 68130.5 and 89007.7 of, and to add Section 44230.6 to, the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Postsecondary education: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3255 HIGHER ED. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By MEDINA (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3255 HIGHER ED. (Medina) By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3255 HIGHER ED. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3255 HIGHER ED. (Medina) By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3255 HIGHER ED. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 505, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6867.). |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5780.). |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5219.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2018-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 15. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44230.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 66025.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 68075 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 68101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 68130.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69432.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69439 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 69562 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 76140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 84760.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 89007.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |