CA AB3252 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 9268 and 9272 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Biologics: animal blood and blood component products: commercial blood banks for animals: licensed private veterinarians: exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3252 AGRI. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on AGRI.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
2018-03-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code9268Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code9272Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback