CA AB3251 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to armories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of armories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3251 V. A. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By IRWIN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent AB3251 V.A (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 3251 V. A. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 726, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-07AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2018-08-29AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6828.).
2018-08-24AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5704.).
2018-08-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-06-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-05-30SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and V.A.
2018-05-17SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5218.)
2018-05-10AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9).
2018-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Coms. on V.A. and A. & A.R.
2018-03-06AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 5.
2018-03-05AssemblyRead first time. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback