CA AB325 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50832.2 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to economic development.
Title
Community Development Block Grant Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-01 - Assembly - AB 325 WOOD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB325 Wood (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 325 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB325 Wood (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 325 WOOD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 397, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2715.). |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2117.). |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1800.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50832.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50860 | Amended Code | Citation Text |