CA AB3249 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30, 6001, 6001.1, 6001.2, 6002, 6002.1, 6003, 6004, 6005, 6006, 6007, 6008.1, 6008.4, 6009.5, 6013.5, 6015, 6016, 6020, 6022, 6023, 6024, 6031, 6031.5, 6032, 6033, 6044, 6044.5, 6046, 6046.5, 6049, 6049.1, 6049.2, 6051, 6053, 6054, 6056, 6060, 6060.3, 6061, 6062, 6068, 6069, 6070, 6071, 6075, 6076, 6076.5, 6077, 6077.5, 6078, 6079.1, 6080, 6081, 6082, 6083, 6084, 6085.5, 6086, 6086.1, 6086.2, 6086.65, 6086.8, 6086.10, 6086.13, 6086.14, 6086.15, 6087, 6090.5, 6090.6, 6092, 6092.5, 6093.5, 6094, 6094.5, 6095, 6102, 6103.5, 6103.7, 6125, 6126, 6126.3, 6127, 6140, 6140.02, 6140.03, 6140.05, 6140.1, 6140.12, 6140.16, 6140.5, 6140.55, 6140.56, 6140.6, 6140.7, 6140.9, 6141, 6141.1, 6141.3, 6142, 6143, 6143.5, 6144.5, 6145, 6157, 6157.2, 6157.3, 6157.5, 6158.4, 6158.5, 6158.7, 6159.1, 6167, 6172, 6175, 6175.5, 6177, 6180, 6180.3, 6180.4, 6180.5, 6180.10, 6180.12, 6180.14, 6185, 6190, 6190.1, 6190.3, 6200, 6203, 6211, 6225, 6233, 6235, 6236, 6237, and 6241 of, to amend the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 6040) of Chapter 4 of Division 3 of, to amend and renumber the heading of Article 3 (commencing with Section 6055) of Chapter 4 of Division 3 of, to add Section 6001.3 to, and to repeal Sections 6040, 6041, 6042, 6043, 6045, 6048, and 6090 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 55.32 of the Civil Code, to amend Section 9795 of the Government Code, to amend Section 1872.95 of the Insurance Code, and to amend Section 19280 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to attorneys.
Title
State Bar Act: attorneys: discipline: annual membership fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Assembly - AB 3249 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3249 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3249 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3249 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 3249 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By STONE (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 659, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6899.). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6773.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5894.). |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5462.) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |