CA AB3248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1010.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Sections 3901, 5614, and 7643 of, and to repeal and add Section 17311.7 of, the Family Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Judiciary omnibus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3248 JUD. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By STONE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3248 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 3248 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3248 JUD. (Stone) By Jackson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - AB 3248 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 504, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6786.) |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5879.). |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5043.) |
2018-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1010.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 630.30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 17311.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 3901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 5614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 7643 | Amended Code | Citation Text |