CA AB3247 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1281.2 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to arbitration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Arbitration: agreements: enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB3247 JUD (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - AB 3247 JUD. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 106, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-07-02SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5037.).
2018-06-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19).
2018-05-24SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-15SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5169.)
2018-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2018-05-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-28AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2018-02-27AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1281.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Civil Code51Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback